Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. King et al
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Calvin King, Allie King, Treasure Coast Contracting Services, Two Way Communications and Baldwin County
Case Number: 1:2011cv00577
Filed: October 7, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Conclude Settlement. The deadline for any party to move to reinstate this action is extended to 11/15/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/23/2012. (tgw)
October 23, 2012 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Conclude Settlement by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Burford, Steve)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/2/2012. (tgw)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Richard Hill, Jr. terminated as counsel for Baldwin County, Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/4/2012. (tgw)
September 4, 2012 Filing 42 REPLY to #40 Response to Motion of Baldwin County filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Burford, Steve)
August 31, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION for C. Richard Hill to Withdraw as Attorney by Baldwin County. (Hill, Charles)
August 21, 2012 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re: #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Baldwin County. (Hill, Charles)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order on the #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 8/21/2012. Replies to Response to S/J due by 9/4/2012. The motion will be taken under submission on 9/4/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/25/2012. (tgw)
July 24, 2012 Filing 38 Brief filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company re #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Burford, Steve)
July 24, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Burford, Steve)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company against Treasure Coast Contracting Services as to all claims and causes of action asserted by plaintiff. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that plaintiff does not owe Treasure Coast a defense, nor is it required to indemnify Treasure Coast in the underlying litigation pending in the Circuit Court of Baldwin County, Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/15/2012. (tgw)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Default Judgment against Treasure Coast Contracting Services, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/15/2012. (tgw)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to TREASURE COAST CONTRACTING SVSC, LLC filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/27/2012. Replies due by 5/4/2012. Motion to be taken under submission on 5/4/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/13/2012. (sdb)
April 3, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to TREASURE COAST CONTRACTING SVSC, LLC by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Burford, Steve) Modified on 4/4/2012 (tgw).
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2013 09:30 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2012. Discovery cutoff 9/28/2012. Motions due by 10/29/2012. This non-jury matter will be set for trial during the month of May, 2013. Position Regarding Settlement due by 9/28/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/17/12. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw)
February 17, 2012 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Burford, Steve)
February 13, 2012 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Declaratory Judgment by Two Way Communications. (Spear, G.)
February 10, 2012 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Baldwin County. (Hill, Charles)
February 10, 2012 Filing 28 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Response to Order to Show Cause #27 filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Steele, William)
February 10, 2012 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #19 Order to Show Cause, filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Burford, Steve)
February 6, 2012 Answer due from Two Way Communications on 2/23/2012 - see doc. 26. (tgw)
February 6, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company Notice of Filing Return of Service on Two Way Communications (Burford, Steve)
February 3, 2012 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Treasure Coast Contracting Services. (tgw)
February 1, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company Amended Notice of Filing Return of Service (Burford, Steve)
February 1, 2012 Filing 23 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against Treasure Coast Contracting Services . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Affidavit Steve Burford) (Burford, Steve)
January 31, 2012 Filing 22 Alias Summons Issued as to Two Way Communications. (Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tgw)
January 31, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company to Two Way Communictions (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement) (Burford, Steve)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order denying #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Baldwin County. Answer due from Baldwin County on 2/10/2012. Plaintiff's duty-to-indemnify claim is stayed. This action will proceed as to Penn National's contention that it owes no duty to defend any party in the King Litigation. The parties must file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 2/17/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/30/12. (tgw)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing the plaintiff by 2/10/2012 to show cause why it has not sought entry of default against the defendants Treasure Coast and Two-Way for failure to answer the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/27/12. (tgw)
December 20, 2011 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion #13 to Dismiss filed by Baldwin County. (Hill, Charles)
December 14, 2011 Filing 17 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge William H. Steele. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
December 9, 2011 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Burford, Steve)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Baldwin County, The plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to the motion on or before December 13, 2011 and the moving defendant its reply not later than December 20, 2011. Briefing with respect to this motion will then be CLOSED. Motion to be taken under submission on 12/21/2011. Should a written consent of the parties not be filed with the Clerk by December 13, 2011, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign this action to a United States District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/29/2011. (Attachments: #1 Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge) (eec)
November 28, 2011 Filing 14 Brief filed by Baldwin County re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Baldwin County. (Hill, Charles)
November 28, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Baldwin County. (Hill, Charles)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/22/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/7/2011. (eec)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Baldwin County has until November 28, 2011 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/3/2011. (eec)
November 3, 2011 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Allie King, Calvin King. (Hicks, John)
November 3, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bradford Boyd Hicks on behalf of Allie King, Calvin King (Hicks, John)
November 2, 2011 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Baldwin County. (Hill, Charles)
October 18, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company Notice of Filing Return of Service of Certified Mail Summons (Burford, Steve)
October 13, 2011 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (clr)
October 13, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Two Way Communications. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (clr)
October 13, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Treasure Coast Contracting Services. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (clr)
October 13, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Allie King, Calvin King. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (clr)
October 13, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Baldwin County. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (clr)
October 7, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baldwin County, Allie King, Calvin King, Treasure Coast Contracting Services, Two Way Communications ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 1128-1160167, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to Baldwin County, #2 Exhibit Summons to Kings, #3 Exhibit Summons to Treasure Coast, #4 Exhibit Summons to Two-Way) (Burford, Steve) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2011: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (clr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steve R. Burford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin King
Represented By: John Bradford Boyd Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allie King
Represented By: John Bradford Boyd Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasure Coast Contracting Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Way Communications
Represented By: G. Randall Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin County
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Kendrick E. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?