Clarke v. Tolbert Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Clarke
Defendant: Tolbert Enterprises, LLC and Sopramco, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00643
Filed: November 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting Tolbert Enterprises' 63 Motion for Attorney Fees, and awarding attorney's fees in the amount of $17,760.28, assessed jointly and severally against Dr. Ronald Clarke and Paradise Land Enterprises, LLC. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/11/2013. (mab)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ADOPTING 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of the Court; granting defendant Sopramco's 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; and dismissing with prejudice plaintiffs' claims against defendant Sopramco CV8. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/29/2013. (mab)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this court, GRANTING 37 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Tolbert Enterprises, LLC, and DISMISSING plaintiff's claims against Tolbert Enterprises, LLC with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/26/2013. (mab)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting plaintiff's, 28 MOTION for leave to amend complaint, and denying as moot defendants' 19 & 22 MOTIONs to Dismiss. Plaintiff's amended complaint to be filed on or before 8/9/2012. Defendants' answers due no later than 8/23/2012. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/2/2012. (mab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. Tolbert Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Clarke
Represented By: Steven L. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tolbert Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sopramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?