Wright v. Klassic Kar Wash, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Chad Wright
Defendant: Klassic Kar Wash, L.L.C. and Pete Holifield
Case Number: 1:2011cv00658
Filed: November 22, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Chad Wright against Pete Holifield in the total amount of $38,146.50. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/9/2013. (copy to deft) (mab)
November 26, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 26 Motion for Default Judgment as set out. Judgment shall issue by separate order after the court's consideration of the Plf's motion for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/26/2012. (copy mailed to Dft Pete Holified on 11/27/12) (tot)
November 8, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plf's 23 Motion for Default Judgment w/leave to refile in conformity w/the requirements of the SCRA as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/8/2012. (tot)
January 26, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 7 Notice of Dismissal. Plf's claims against Dft Klassic Kar Wash, L.L.C. are DISMISSED w/o prejudice as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/26/12. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Klassic Kar Wash, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klassic Kar Wash, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Wright
Represented By: Banks C. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?