Mitchell v. Bentley et al

Plaintiff: Lewis Mitchell
Defendant: Robert Bentley, Luther Strange and Taishiera Parker
Case Number: 1:2011cv00687
Filed: December 5, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this action with prejudice and judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/10/2012. (cmj)
February 28, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/28/2012. (cmj)
February 17, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered 10 Motion for Temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Having RECONSIDERED the February 16, 2012 Order (Doc. 11), it is hereby ORDERED that Doc. 11 is RESCINDED; Plaintiffs motion (Doc. 10) is DENIED; and the February 28, 2012 hearing (as well as briefing related to same) is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/17/2012. (mca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Bentley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taishiera Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Mitchell
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?