Woods v. BD&S Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paul Woods
Defendant: BD&S Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00711
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Monroe
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to an order this day entered, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/10/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
March 20, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 13 Answers and Corrections to Complaint and MOTION to Dismiss filed by BD&S Service, Inc. The request for dismissal is denied. BD&S Services is ordered by 4/10/2012 to notify the Court of the name of the counsel it has retained to represent its interests in this action. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/20/2012. Copy mailed to BD&S Services c/o Al Brewton. (tgw)
January 13, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 7 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default filed by Paul Woods. Plaintiff is ordered by 1/27/2012 to file a supplemental memorandum addressing whether service of process has in fact been perfected on defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/13/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. BD&S Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Woods
Represented By: Henry Brewster
Represented By: Daniel A. Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BD&S Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?