Vinson et al v. Critter Control Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jonas Vinson and David Higdon
Defendant: Critter Control Inc., Critter Control of the Gulf Coast, Critter Control of Jackson, MS, LLC and Critter Control of South LA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00714
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: Family & Medical Leave Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Supplement Motion for Settlement Approval and the settlement agreement as made during the settlement conference is approved. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/25/2013. (cmj)
December 28, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 25 MOTION for Settlement filed by Jonas Vinson, David Higdon. This action is dismissed without prejudice as to defendant Critter Control, Inc. The joint motion to approve settlement is DENIED with leave to re-file by 1/18/13 to include information as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/28/2012. (cmj)
November 1, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that the claims asserted by Jonas Vinson be dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. As to the FLSA claims asserted by plaintiff David Higdon, the parties are ordered to file a motion to approve settlement by 11/26/12. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 11/26/2012.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/31/12. (cmj)
October 15, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 20 request for dismissal filed by Critter Control Inc., Jonas Vinson, David Higdon as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/15/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinson et al v. Critter Control Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonas Vinson
Represented By: Daniel A. Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Higdon
Represented By: Daniel A. Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critter Control Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critter Control of the Gulf Coast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critter Control of Jackson, MS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critter Control of South LA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?