Reeves v. Veterans Administration

Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Reeves
Defendant: Veterans Administration
Case Number: 1:2012cv00006
Filed: January 6, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 23 Objection filed by Dennis Roy Reeves. The Court construes Reeves' objection as a motion for reconsideration. The motion to reconsider is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/3/2012. copy mailed. (sdb)
June 7, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Veterans Administration is GRANTED.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/6/2012. (copy mailed) (cmj)
June 6, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/6/2012. (copy mailed) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?