Hawk v. Klaetsch et al

Plaintiff: Michael Gabriel Hawk
Defendant: Sean Klaetsch, Trent Robinson, Charlotte Pollard, Morrow Company, Pete Wolfe, III, James Simpson, City of Evergreen, AL, Edwin Booker and County Commission of Conecuh County, AL
Case Number: 1:2012cv00058
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Retax costs. The defendants are awarded costs of $1,361.60. In all other respects, the defendants' motion is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/6/2013. (tgw)
May 14, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/14/2012. (tgw)
April 3, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 5 MOTION to Dismiss. Conecuh County, the Conecuh County Commission and Sheriff Edwin Booker are dismissed as defendants for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. The defendants' request for award of costs and fees is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/3/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawk v. Klaetsch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gabriel Hawk
Represented By: Larry C. Moorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Klaetsch
Represented By: Randall Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Robinson
Represented By: Thomas B. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrow Company
Represented By: Benjamin Connell Heinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Wolfe, III
Represented By: Thomas B. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Simpson
Represented By: Thomas B. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Evergreen, AL
Represented By: Thomas B. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Booker
Represented By: J. Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Commission of Conecuh County, AL
Represented By: J. Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?