Mosley v. Alabama Unified Judicial System

Plaintiff: Linda Johnson Mosley
Defendant: Alabama Unified Judicial System, Administrative Office of Courts
Case Number: 1:2012cv00184
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plf's 101 Motion to Alter or Amend as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/4/2014. (tot)
July 25, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plf's 80 Motion to Strike Witness Affidavits, Plf's 81 Motion to Strike Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I & II, Plf's 82 Motion to Strike Portions of Judge Naman's Affadavit & GRANTING Dfts' 76 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/25/2014. (tot)
May 29, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plf's 60 Motion for Reconsideration as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/29/2013. (tot)
May 10, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts, the Alabama Administrative Office of the Courts, the Juvenile Court of Mobile County, Alabama, Judge Edmond Naman, & Lawrence Battiste & against Plf, Linda Johnson Moseley in accordance w/the court's order entered this date. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/9/2013. (tot)
May 9, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dfts' 39 Motion for Summary Judgment as to all counts as set out. Plf's 51 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED, & Plf's 52 Motion to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/9/2013. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Alabama Unified Judicial System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Johnson Mosley
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Unified Judicial System, Administrative Office of Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?