Whitney Bank v. Swearingen

Plaintiff: Whitney Bank
Defendant: Thomas C. Swearingen
Case Number: 1:2012cv00198
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plf Whitney Bank against Dft Thomas C. Swearingen in the amount of $108,749.87 as set out. Thomas Swearingen's counter-claims against Whitney Bank are DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/5/2013. (copy mailed to Dft on 2/5/13) (tot)
January 17, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Plf Whitney Bank's 56 Motion for Summary Judgment on Dft's Counter-Claims is GRANTED as set out. Whitney Bank is to file a proposed final judgment consistent w/the court's summary judgment on or before 1/31/13. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/17/2013. (tot) (copy mailed to Dft on 1/18/13) Modified on 1/18/2013 (tot).
November 28, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, granting plaintiff's 53 supplementary motion for summary judgment, finding that the balance owed by Mr. Swearingen under the Note in question through October 31, 2012, including attorney's fees incurred in at tempting to recover the debt, is $105,752.91. The court notes that Mr. Swearingen's counterclaim (Doc. 43 ) remains pending. Discovery and the time allowed for dispositive motions are currently set to expire on 11/30/12. Final judgment will be entered once all claims are resolved. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/28/2012. (copy to deft) (mab)
October 24, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Plf's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/24/2012. (copy mailed to Plf on 10/25/12) (tot) Modified on 10/25/2012 (tot).
June 14, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dft's 6 MOTION to Change Venue, 10 AMENDED MOTION to Change Venue is DENIED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/14/2012. (copy mailed to Dft on 6/15/12) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney Bank v. Swearingen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Bank
Represented By: Annie J. Dike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Swearingen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?