Continental Motors, Inc. v. Jewell Aircraft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Continental Motors, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Jewell Aircraft, Inc., John Jewell Aircraft, Inc. and John Jewell |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00221 |
Filed: |
March 28, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Mobile Office |
County: |
Mobile |
Presiding Judge: |
William E. Cassady |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Steele |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 17, 2013 |
Filing
116
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Strike CMI's Expert Disclosures and Motion to Prohibit those Experts from Testifying. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/17/2013. (tgw)
|
October 4, 2013 |
Filing
111
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Strike expert report of Mack B. Binion ; denying [] Motion to prohibit Mr Binion from testifying as a witness. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/4/2013. (srr)
|
October 2, 2013 |
Filing
109
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/1/2013. (tgw)
|
December 28, 2012 |
Filing
56
Order re: 54 Objection filed by Jewell Aircraft, Inc. The Court exercises its inherent powers to strike the Objection as procedurally improper, inappropriate and inefficient. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/28/2012. (mbp)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
47
ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count III of the Complaint. Count III of the complaint, alleging a cause of action for common-law indemnity under Kentucky law, is dismissed without prejudice, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/28/2012. (clr)
|
July 31, 2012 |
Filing
23
Order granting in part denying in part 3 MOTION to Dismiss, as set out. The 11 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal is granted and those exhibits will be maintained under seal. This action will proceed against defendant Jewell Aircraft, Inc. (John Jewell and John Jewell Aircraft, Inc. terminated.) Answer due from Jewell Aircraft, Inc. on 8/10/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/30/2012. (tgw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Continental Motors, Inc. v. Jewell Aircraft, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Continental Motors, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Mark Brannon Roberts |
Represented By: |
Edward A. Dean |
Represented By: |
Sherri Rich Ginger |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jewell Aircraft, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Albert Danner Frazer, Jr. |
Represented By: |
David Alan Strassburg, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John Jewell Aircraft, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Albert Danner Frazer, Jr. |
Represented By: |
David Alan Strassburg, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John Jewell |
Represented By: |
Albert Danner Frazer, Jr. |
Represented By: |
David Alan Strassburg, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?