Matthews v. City of Mobile Police Department

Plaintiff: Cassandra Matthews
Defendant: City of Mobile Police Department
Case Number: 1:2012cv00353
Filed: May 24, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/31/2013. (cmj)
January 18, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City Of Mobile. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, "Mobile Police Department" made in the Third Amended Complaint are dismissed. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/18/2013. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
October 12, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting 21 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff shall file by 11/8/12 a 3rd Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/12/2012. (srr)
July 31, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 9 Amended Complaint filed by Cassandra Matthews. By 8/20/2012, Plf shall submit a completed summons to be issued by the clerk and served on the defendant along with a copy of the amended complaint, and a copy of the EEOC's right-to-sue letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/31/2012. copy mailed to plf regular and certified mail as directed. (certified mail rec. # 70112000000139804066) (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. City of Mobile Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mobile Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?