Allen et al v. The City of Evergreen, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Dan Allen, Bobby Watkins and Alberta Lee
Defendant: Luther Upton, Diane Skipper, John Skinner, Jr., Vivian Fountain, Maxine Harris, Becky B. Robinson, The City of Evergreen, Alabama and Pete Wolff, III
Case Number: 1:2012cv00496
Filed: August 6, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Conecuh
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Three Judge Panel Order VACATING 24 Partial Consent Agreement and ENJOINING Defendant's as further set out. Signed by Circuit Judge Ed Carnes, District Judge Callie V.S. Granade, and District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/1/2013. (jlr)
December 14, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL CONSENT AGREEMENT TO A NEW ELECTION DATE, that part of the Court's 8 Order dated 8/20/12 setting the City of Evergreen election 12/15/12 is VACATED as to the election date, & the election date only. City of Evergreen is ENJOINED to conduct a new special election on 2/26/13 as set out. Special Master is authorized & directed to file a Final Report upon the completion of his duties as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/14/2012. (tot)
August 20, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL CONSENT AGREEMENT re: 7 Joint MOTION for Consent Decree to resolve the issues under Section 5 of the Voting Rights Act and specifically to prevent the August 28, 2012 municipal election from being held in violation of federal law and to develop procedures for a special city election to be held on December 15, 2012 as further set out; Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 8/20/2012. (mjn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. The City of Evergreen, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Upton
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Skipper
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Skinner, Jr.
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Fountain
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxine Harris
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky B. Robinson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Evergreen, Alabama
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Wolff, III
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Allen
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Watkins
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberta Lee
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?