Payne v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Amanda L. Payne
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2012cv00571
Filed: September 6, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Amanda L. Payne. It is ordered that petitioner receive a reasonable fee in the amount of $5,508 for services rendered in this court and upon receipt of this sum from SSA, Petitioner must refund to Payne the smaller attorney-fee award made in this case of $3,306.06. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/13/2014. (cmj)
September 9, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Amanda L. Payne against Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/9/2013. (cmj)
May 8, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to Agency to Social Security Administration filed by Michael J. Astrue. The decision of the Acting Commissioner of Social Security denying Plaintiff benefits is reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/7/2013. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda L. Payne
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?