Roberson v. BancorpSouth Bank, Inc.

Plaintiff: Adria E. Roberson
Defendant: BancorpSouth Bank, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00669
Filed: October 24, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. It is ordered that this action be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/4/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
September 12, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Amend Complaint as untimely. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/12/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 19, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order: The defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (doc. 26, at #6) is granted, as set out. There being no other claims or causes of action pending against Phillip Webb, the Clerk is directed to terminate that defendant. This action shall proceed with respect to Roberson's Title VII claims against Bancorp on theories of sexually hostile work environment, gender discrimination, and retaliation. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/19/2013. (tgw)
June 14, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Consolidating Cases. Lead Case No.: 12-669-WS-N, Member Case No.: 12-716-CG-N. All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to submit a JS-6 to the Administrative Office which indicates that 12-0716 is statistically closed. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/14/2013. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v. BancorpSouth Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adria E. Roberson
Represented By: L. Bratton Rainey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BancorpSouth Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?