Darley v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jepson Darley
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00014
Filed: January 15, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: Family & Medical Leave Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf's claims against Dft are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE, & sanctions are awarded to Dft in the amount of $5,348.00 as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/11/2014. (tot)
March 10, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: Dft's 25 MOTION for Sanctions & 30 Affidavit in Support of Attorneys' Fees. Plf's counsel is ORDERED to pay Dft $5,348.00 as a sanction as set out. Plf's counsel is to pay the sanction directly to Dft on or bef ore 3/31/14 & should contact defense counsel regarding where & how such payment should be sent. Plf's counsel is to file a notice w/the court to confirm receipt of the payment by his client. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/10/2014. (tot)
February 10, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING Dft's 25 MOTION to Dismiss & MOTION for Sanctions as set out. Defendant will be awarded the reasonable expenses, including attny's fees, caused by Plf's failure to timely answer discovery & to comply w/this court' ;s order to compel. Dft is to submit on or before 2/24/2014 an accounting by affidavit of any additional fees & expenses which were incurred as a result of Plf's delay in providing discovery. Any objection should be filed within 5 days of service of the affidavit. Final judgment will be entered once all of the attny fee issues have been decided. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/10/2014. (tot) (Main Document 29 replaced on 2/10/2014) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darley v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jepson Darley
Represented By: Steven L. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?