PNC Bank, N.A. v. Serenity Care, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Serenity Care, Inc. and Melvin Richardson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00074
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 21 Motion for Default Judgment, the court finds that plaintiff is entitled to judgment against Serenity Care for the principal, interest and late fees claimed under the note. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit billing records and an affidavit reflecting the time and rate that were incurred. Once the court makes its findings with regard to the requested attorney's fees, judgment will be entered. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/30/2014. (mab)
April 3, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, the clerk is directed to close this matter for statistical purposes as set out. The parties shall file a written notice w/the court within 30 days of the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings as to Serenity Care, Inc., or of a lift of the stay, at which time this action will be reinstated to the court's active docket. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/3/2013. (tot)
March 27, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of PNC Bank, N.A. against Dft Melvin Richardson in the total amount of $270,891.84 as set out. Costs are taxed to Dft Richardson, for which let execution issue. This action shall remain pending as to the Corporate Dft, Serenity Care, Inc., due to its pending bankruptcy case, to be disposed of in due course. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/27/2013. (copy mailed to Dft @ 8505 Gayla Court, Mobile, AL 36695, on 3/28/13) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, N.A. v. Serenity Care, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: C. Lee Reeves
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ortega
Represented By: George M. Neal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serenity Care, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?