Young v. May, et al

Plaintiff: David M. Young
Defendant: Joe Jordan and GEORGE MAY
Case Number: 1:2013cv00091
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - In accordance with the Orders entered on this date (doc. 132 ) and on May 22, 2013 (doc. 110 ), it is ordered, that plaintiff's claims against defendant George May are dismissed with prejudice and that his claims against defendant Joe Carl Jordan are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/25/2013. Copy mailed to plf. (sdb)
June 25, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Court imposes an initial partial filing fee of $12.07. The Federal BOP is directed to collect payments pursuant to 28:1915(b)(2). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/25/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff, BOP & Business Manager at Forrest City Medium. (tgw)
June 10, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying the 114 MOTION for Default against defendant Joe Carl Jordan. Defendant Jordan is ordered by 6/13/2013 to file an Amended Certificate of Service reflecting that he has served plaintiff with a copy of the Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 111). Responses to the 105 Motion to Dismiss and the 111 Brief are due by 6/28/2013, Replies due by 7/5/2013. The 115 MOTION For Joinder of Party is denied and the 116 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/10/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
May 22, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 87 MOTION to Dismiss filed by George May. Plaintiff's claims against defendant May are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This action will proceed as to plaintiff's claims against defendant Joe Carl Jordan. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/22/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. May, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Jordan
Represented By: Joe Carl Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE MAY
Represented By: Charles Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?