Wright Transportation, Inc. v. Pilot Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Wright Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Pilot Corporation, Pilot Travel Centers, LLC, James A. Haslam, III, John Freeman, Brian Mosher and Mark Hazelwood
Case Number: 1:2013cv00352
Filed: July 10, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 104 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions by Wright Transportation, Inc.. The plaintiff's motion to dismiss is granted and its motion for sanctions is denied. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Section 1367(c). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/27/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
January 9, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part the 31 Motion to Dismiss, 34 Motion to Dismiss, 36 Motion to Dismiss & 38 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/9/2014. (tgw)
October 21, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 18 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Pilot Corporation, Pilot Travel Centers, LLC. The Magistrate Judge's order is AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/21/2013. Copies to parties. (sdb)
August 19, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order on Motion to Stay re: 7 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Pilot Corporation, Pilot Travel Centers, LLC, is DENIED; defendants answer due by 9/3/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/19/2013. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright Transportation, Inc. v. Pilot Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wright Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Tunstall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Corporation
Represented By: Parker David Kasmer
Represented By: M. Christian King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Represented By: Parker David Kasmer
Represented By: M. Christian King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Haslam, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mosher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?