Prassenos v. E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company et al

Plaintiff: Emma Prassenos
Defendant: Beneflex Employee Life Insurance Plan of E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company and E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00419
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, as set out, Defendants' 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting, as set out, Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II. The Motions for Summary Judgment as to Count III are moot per doc. 65. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/16/2015. (cmj) Modified on 1/16/2015 (cmj).
October 27, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order STRIKING 55 Suggestion of Death filed by Emma Prassenos, as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/27/2014. (cmj)
April 2, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED and Plaintiff's jury demand is STRICKEN.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/2/2014. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prassenos v. E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneflex Employee Life Insurance Plan of E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Terrence William McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Terrence William McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Prassenos
Represented By: Charles J. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?