Hollingsworth v. Thomas et al

Plaintiff: Richard Hollingsworth
Defendant: Kim T. Thomas, Gary Hetzel, Ronzella Howard, Brandon Carroll and Robert Byrd
Case Number: 1:2013cv00480
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order and to prosecute this action. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/16/2016. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
August 22, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's claims againstDefendants Carroll and Byrd be dismissed without prejudice from this action, prior to service of process, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/22/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
May 30, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's claims againstDefendants Carroll and Byrd be dismissed without prejudice from this action, prior to service of process, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/30/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollingsworth v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim T. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronzella Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?