Eternal Word Television Network, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al

Plaintiff: State of Alabama and Eternal Word Television Network, Inc.
Defendant: Jacob Lew, Thomas Perez, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury and United States Department of Labor
Case Number: 1:2013cv00521
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending appeal. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/19/2014. (mab)
June 18, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of the Treasury, Jacob Lew, Sylvia M. Burwell, Thomas Perez against Eternal Word Television Network, Inc. and State of Alabama. Counts I, II, V and IX of the Plaintiff's complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice. Costs are to be taxed against the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/18/2014. (mab)
June 17, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 34 ) is DENIED with respect to Counts XII, XIII, XIV, XVI, XVII, and is GRANTED with respect to all remaining claims; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED with respect to Counts XII, XIII, XIV, XVI, and XVII; EWTN's 56(d) motion (Doc. 51 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/17/2014. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eternal Word Television Network, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Andrew L. Brasher
Represented By: William G. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eternal Word Television Network, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Windham
Represented By: Stuart Kyle Duncan
Represented By: Daniel Howard Blomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?