Dailey v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Marilyn C. Dailey
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2013cv00559
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Conecuh
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, Petitioner's 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees be is GRANTED, & Petitioner Byron A. Lassister, Esq., is awarded attorney's fees in the sum of $2,710.75 as set out. Pet is instructed to refund to Plf the lesser award in the amount of $2,710.75 as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/9/2015. (tot)
October 21, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf's 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act be GRANTED & Plf is awarded a reasonable attny's fee in the amount of $3,906.71 under EAJA as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/21/2014. (tot)
June 25, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/25/2014. (mab)
June 23, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the parties' 17 Joint MOTION to Remand be GRANTED, & that this Court enter judgment reversing & remanding this cause to the Commissioner for action consistent w/the parties' motion as set out. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/23/2014. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dailey v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn C. Dailey
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?