SE Property Holdings, LLC v. ZLM Acquisitions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
SE Property Holdings, LLC |
Defendant: |
ZLM Acquisitions, LLC, Zeke's Landing Marina, LLC, Thomas P. Steber, Jr., Maurice J. Fitzsimons and David A. Stewart |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00610 |
Filed: |
December 12, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Mobile Office |
County: |
Baldwin |
Presiding Judge: |
Katherine P. Nelson |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
84
JUDGMENT in favor of Plf SE Property Holdings, LLC against Dft Maurice J. Fitzsimons in the amount of $2,132,800.00 plus interest & costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/29/2015. (tot)
|
October 6, 2014 |
Filing
58
Order re: 57 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. This action is STAYED as to Dft David A. Stewart. Parties shall notify the court within 30 days of the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings, or of a lift of the stay, at which time this action will be reinstated against Dft Stewart. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/6/2014. (tot)
|
July 21, 2014 |
Filing
52
Order GRANTING in part parties' 51 Joint MOTION to Stay in that all proceedings are STAYED until 9/30/14 by agreement of the parties. Parties are to file a joint status report as to the pendency of the Bankruptcy case NLT 10/1/2014. Unless the parties move for a further extension, the stay will be lifted, & this action will be referred to the Magistrate Judge for entry of an amended scheduling order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/21/2014. (tot)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. ZLM Acquisitions, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC |
Represented By: |
Allen E. Graham |
Represented By: |
Meaghan E. Hill |
Represented By: |
Ashley E. Swink |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: ZLM Acquisitions, LLC |
Represented By: |
James Willis Garrett, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Zeke's Landing Marina, LLC |
Represented By: |
James Willis Garrett, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Thomas P. Steber, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Maurice J. Fitzsimons |
Represented By: |
Marion E. Wynne, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: David A. Stewart |
Represented By: |
James Willis Garrett, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?