John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Defendant: Ursula C. Allen and Carla L. Walker
Case Number: 1:2013cv00613
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER finding as moot 47 Motion to Strike with respect to the Carla Walker Affidavit and denied in all other respects; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/22/2014. (tgw)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/28/2014. Copy mailed to Frank Kruse, Esq. as set out. (tgw)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order finding as MOOT 36 MOTION for Leave to File Joinder of Necessary Party filed by Carla L. Walker. Denying 38 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Any REPLY to the 37 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Joinder of Necessary Party due by 10/7/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/2/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order granting 29 MOTION Motion to Discharge. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) is dismissed and discharged with prejudice from this action & from further liability or obligations to defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/19/2014. (tgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula C. Allen
Represented By: Charles H. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Represented By: Charles D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?