Church v. Accretive Health, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mahala A. Church
Defendant: Accretive Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00057
Filed: February 11, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Motions to Seal (docs. 93, 102, 105, 109) as further set out, In all other respects, the Motions to Seal are deemed withdrawn based on defendant's representations in the Supplemental Brief (doc. 113). The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents found at Doc. 102 except for plaintiff's Exhibits A, C, E and G, which are to remain sealed. Defendant is to file properly redacted unsealed versions of plaintiff's Exhibits A, C and E by 1/8/16. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/28/2015. (mbp)
November 24, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Accretive Health, Inc. The 108 MOTION to Exclude New Evidence Filed with Reply Brief filed by Mahala A. Church is denied. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant is ordered by 12/8/2015 to file a supplemental memorandum re: Motions to Seal (Docs. 93, 102, 105 and 109). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/24/2015. (tgw)
December 16, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 43 MOTION to Dismiss and, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Accretive Health, Inc.. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/13/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/16/2014. (tgw)
April 24, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to to Enter Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, then Stay Further Consideration of the Same; denying 14 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/24/2014. (tgw) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/24/2014) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church v. Accretive Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahala A. Church
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accretive Health, Inc.
Represented By: Sandy G. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?