Beech et al v. Fishing Vessel FV WISHBONE

Plaintiff: Adam Beech and Tenley Warhurst
Defendant: FV WISHBONE
Intervenor_plaintiff: Kris Leith
Intervenor_defendant: Skippers Landing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00241
Filed: May 29, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion to Alter Judgment, denying 77 Motion for Taxation of Costs; granting 76 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. The Vessel Release Bond posted on June 3, 2014 (Skippers Landing as principal, FCCI Insurance Company as surety) is hereby discharged. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/21/2015. (tgw)
June 15, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Complaint of plaintiffs Adam Beech and Tenley Warhurst and the Complaint in Intervention of plaintiff Kris Leith are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/15/2015. (tgw)
December 2, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 39 MOTION to Amend Answer filed by Skippers Landing, Inc. Skippers Landing is ordered by 12/5/2014 to file the Amended Answers. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/2/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beech et al v. Fishing Vessel FV WISHBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Beech
Represented By: Gregory C. Buffalow(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenley Warhurst
Represented By: Gregory C. Buffalow(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FV WISHBONE
Represented By: Craig D. Olmstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Kris Leith
Represented By: Gregory C. Buffalow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Skippers Landing, Inc.
Represented By: Craig D. Olmstead(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?