Warhurst v. One Twenty Foot Bertran

Plaintiff: Earnest E. Warhurst, Jr.
Defendant: One Twenty Foot Bertran and David L Jones
Counter_claimant: David L Jones
Counter_defendant: Earnest E. Warhurst, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00245
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion for Bond; denying 79 Motion to Stay execution; plaintiff is to show cause by 5/1/15 why the defendant's motion for writ of execution should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/24/2015. (srr)
March 13, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a bench trial was held 12/30/14 before the undersigned; the court finds in favor of Defendant/Counterclaimant David Jones as to the claim for damages, in the amount of, $5,505.00, consisting of $3,055.00 in unpaid repair bills an d $2,450.00 in storage fees. The substitute custodian, Sportsman Marine, is ORDERED to immediately release to Plaintiff Eugene Warhurst the vessel bearing Alabama Registration No. AL8238LM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/13/2015. (srr)
November 10, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Supplement; denying 57 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/7/2014. (srr)
September 16, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Amend Answer to Counterclaim; Plaintiff's Notice of Expert Disclosure 37 is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/15/2014. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warhurst v. One Twenty Foot Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest E. Warhurst, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory C. Buffalow(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Twenty Foot Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Jones
Represented By: Daniel G. Sayers(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: David L Jones
Represented By: Daniel G. Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Earnest E. Warhurst, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory C. Buffalow(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?