Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. v. Crosby et al

Plaintiff: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.
Defendant: Stephen D. Crosby and Karen Crosby
Case Number: 1:2014cv00259
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Choctaw
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Attorney Fees and costs in the amount of $10,485.79. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/3/2015. (cmj)
July 23, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Confirm Sale and for Entry of Final Judgment. The foreclosure sale is confirmed and VMF is due a deficiency balance of $508.11. The Court reserves ruling regarding VMF's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. VMF is ordered to supplement its motion by 8/7/15. The Court withholds final judgment until these matters have been resolved. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/23/2015. (cmj)
February 11, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part VMF's 35 partial Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count I in the amount of $70,416.68. The Motion to Strike contained in document 41 is construed by the Court as objections and are overruled. VMF is ordered to file a supplement to its motion, as set out, by 2/20/15. The Crosbys should file a response by 2/27/15. VMF's request for attorneys' fees is premature and may re-file a motion for attorneys' fees at the conclusion of this case. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/11/2015. (cmj)
October 27, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stephen D. Crosby, Karen Crosby is denied as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/27/2014. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. v. Crosby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Mitchell Hastings
Represented By: Chad Leland Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?