Collar et al v. Austin

Plaintiff: Reed Collar and Bonnie Collar
Defendant: Trevis Austin
Case Number: 1:2014cv00349
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 66 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 73 Moti on to Strike; denying as moot 74 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 76 Motion to Strike; granting 83 Motion to Substitute. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/15/2015. (tgw)
February 5, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 35 Motion to Strike ; granting 21 Motion for Relief Under Rule 56(d). The Magistrate Judge will enter an order establishing a time frame for the discovery. After the discovery is completed, the Court will enter a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/5/2015. (tgw)
September 30, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/30/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collar et al v. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed Collar
Represented By: Samuel Joshua Briskman
Represented By: Benjamin L. Locklar
Represented By: Charles J. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Collar
Represented By: Samuel Joshua Briskman
Represented By: Benjamin L. Locklar
Represented By: Charles J. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevis Austin
Represented By: David Alan Strassburg, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?