Black v. Reynolds et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Black
Defendant: Gary Reynolds and Direct General Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv00442
Filed: September 24, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court Order On Jury Trial: The 118 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by defendants is granted. The plaintiff's claims against the defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/18/2016. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
February 3, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/3/2016. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
February 2, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion in Limine; granting 92 Motion in Limine; granting 93 Motion in Limine; denying 94 Motion in Limine; granting 96 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/2/2016. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
January 29, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the defendants' 87 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order. The plaintiff's claim for breach of contract is dismissed with prejudice.This action will proceed to trial only with respect to the plaintiff's FLSA claim. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/29/2016. Copy mailed to Plaintiff & a copy left at Intake for pickup. (tgw)
December 15, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/15/2015. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct General Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?