Miller v. Spence et al

Plaintiff: Jessica Miller
Defendant: Edwin J. Spence, Edwin J. Spence, Jr., Port II Seafood Oyster Bar, Inc., Gulf Coast Steamer, Inc. and The Shrimp Basket, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00468
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2016 118 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 113 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement. Court finds that the proposed payment to Plfs in the total amount of $260,326.54 is a fair & reasonable settlement as set out. Court also finds that the parties have not provided e nough information for this Court to determine the reasonableness of their proposed payment of attnys' fees & costs. Plfs are to file an amended motion or an affidavit on or before 5/17/2016 as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/3/2016. (tot)
April 22, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Plfs' 11 MOTION for Conditional Certification is GRANTED in part, & DENIED in part, & Dfts' 35 MOTION to Strike 33 Supplemental Evidentiary Submission is DENIED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/22/2015. (tot)
March 10, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING in part & DENYING in part Plf's 25 Motion to Amend Complaint as set out. Motion is GRANTED, in part, to add Mr. Boyett and Ms. Norwood as named plaintiffs & DENIED, in part, as to adding Ms. Bezerra, Mr. Franks, & Ms. Race. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/10/2015. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Spence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Miller
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Arciniegas
Represented By: Jon C. Goldfarb
Represented By: Sean Ivan Goldfarb
Represented By: Lachlan William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin J. Spence
Represented By: Tammy L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin J. Spence, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port II Seafood Oyster Bar, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Steamer, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shrimp Basket, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?