Williamson v. Ball Healthcare Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sharon Williamson
Defendant: Ball Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00552
Filed: November 26, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: Disability Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING all claims W/PREJUDICE subject to the right of any party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement agreement not be consummated. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/22/2016. (tot)
August 11, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Plf's 62 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment & 69 Motion to Strike are DENIED as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/11/2016. (tot)
August 26, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING Dft's 37 Unopposed MOTION to Amend 9 Answer. Dft is directed to file its amended answer NLT 9/2/2015. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/26/2015. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Ball Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Williamson
Represented By: Edward L. D. Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Temple DeAnna Trueblood(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?