Williams v. SDI of Jackson, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sheneaka Williams
Defendant: SDI of Jackson, LLC, Joe Toney and Bradley Dronet
Case Number: 1:2015cv00203
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Clarke
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000rt Job Discrimination/Retaliation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice and Motion to Dismiss contained in Defendants' 41 response is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/9/2017.
November 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff as to Title VII retaliation claim. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/3/2016. (mab)
October 7, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment, and finding Defendants' motions to strike (Docs. 28 & 30 ) to be MOOT. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/7/2016. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. SDI of Jackson, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheneaka Williams
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDI of Jackson, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Dronet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?