Univalor Trust, SA et al v. Columbia Petroleum, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Univalor Trust, SA and Forvest Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Columbia Petroleum, LLC, Columbia International, LLC, Alabama Energy Holdings, II, LLC, Benjamin Energy Holdings, II, LLC, Occidental Energy Partners, LLC and Chester F. English, III
Case Number: 1:2015cv00414
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2017 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 135 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Univalor Trust, SA, Forvest Financial Services Corporation. The motion to dismiss is granted and Counts Two and Three of the counterclaim (doc. 121) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/20/2016. (cmj) Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/10/2017. (cmj)
June 21, 2016 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 99 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion to Amend Answer. Defendants' motion to amend is granted as to Counts 1, 10 and 11 and otherwise denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/21/2016. (cmj)
December 17, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 32 34 35 37 defendants' MOTIONs to Dismiss are denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/16/2015. (cmj)
August 17, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED Order that plaintiffs motion to file settlement agreement under seal is denied, striking settlement agreement (Doc. 3). Court's previous Order 7 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/17/2015. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Univalor Trust, SA et al v. Columbia Petroleum, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Univalor Trust, SA
Represented By: Dorothy A. Barker
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forvest Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Dorothy A. Barker
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Petroleum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Energy Holdings, II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Energy Holdings, II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Energy Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester F. English, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?