Thai Meditation Association of Alabama, Inc. et al v. City of Mobile, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Thai Meditation Association of Alabama, Inc., Sivaporn Nimityongskul, Varin Nimityongskul, Serena Nimityongskul and Prasit Nimityongskul
Defendant: City of Mobile, Alabama, City of Mobile City Council and City of Mobile Planning Commission
Case Number: 1:2016cv00395
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of City of Mobile, Alabama against Thai Meditation Association of Alabama, Inc., Prasit Nimityongskul, Serena Nimityongskul, Sivaporn Nimityongskul, Varin Nimityongskul. Defendant shall be awarded costs reasonable incurred in connection with this case. Motion due by 6/17/2019, with any response due by 6/27/19. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 05/28/2018. (mab)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Bench trial held 3/12/2019 through 3/20/2019, the Court finds in favor of Defendant as to all claims before the Court. A separate judgment will be entered. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 05/23/2019. (mab)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER, GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; and DENYING Plaintiffs' 91 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 09/28/2018. (mab)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, ADOPTING 30 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of this Court; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss; and directing Defendant to file its answer to the remaining claims on or before November 14, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/31/2016. (mab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thai Meditation Association of Alabama, Inc. et al v. City of Mobile, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thai Meditation Association of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Lawler
Represented By: Blair Lazarus Storzer
Represented By: Roman P. Storzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sivaporn Nimityongskul
Represented By: John L. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varin Nimityongskul
Represented By: John L. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serena Nimityongskul
Represented By: John L. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prasit Nimityongskul
Represented By: John L. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mobile, Alabama
Represented By: Douglas L. Anderson
Represented By: Atoyia Scott Harris
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mobile City Council
Represented By: James B. Rossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mobile Planning Commission
Represented By: Douglas L. Anderson
Represented By: Atoyia Scott Harris
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?