Glasker v. Small Wonders

Plaintiff: Erica Glasker
Defendant: Small Wonders
Case Number: 1:2017cv00121
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2018 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/16/18. copy mailed to plaintiff (srr)
December 11, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Compel; by 12/18/17 defendant to file status report pertaining to plaintiff's compliance with discovery obligation; discovery deadline 1/15/18; settlement position 1/22/18; dispositive motions 2/16/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/11/17. copy mailed to plaintiff regular & certified mail (7017 1000 0000 1383 8047) (srr) .
April 7, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Plf is to file an amended IFP motion or sworn supplement as set out or pay the $400 filing fee NLT 4/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/7/2017. (copy mailed to Plf on 4/07/17). (srd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasker v. Small Wonders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Glasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Wonders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?