Allen et al v. Uncle John Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jared Allen, Justin Allen, James Hayes, Jason Keezer, Michael Lunsford, Sanjay Ramchandran and William H. Bishop
Defendant: Uncle John Holdings, LLC, Blue Capital PTE, Ltd., Momentum Engineering, Inc. and Momentum GOM, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00222
Filed: May 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: P. Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DISMISSING this action without prejudice as to Uncle John and Blue Capital for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the rules of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/20/2019. (nah)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs on or before 6/14/2019, why this Court should not dismiss this action without prejudice as to Defendants Uncle John Holdings, LLC and Blue Capital Pte Ltd for Plaintiffs' failure to prosecute. Accordingly, the Final Pretrial Conference set for June 6, 2019 is cancelled. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/03/2019. (nah)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order: The 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in favor of Momentum Engineering, Inc. and Momentum GOM, Inc. as to the Claim for Unpaid Overtime (Count II). Accordingly, Count II is dismissed as to these Defendants; The motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in favor of Momentum Engineering, Inc. as to the Claim for Earned Wages (Count I) and the Claim for Breach of Contract and Loss of Earnings (Count III); and the Plaintiff's 58 MOTION to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/02/2019. (nah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Uncle John Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Allen
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Allen
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hayes
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Keezer
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lunsford
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjay Ramchandran
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Bishop
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uncle John Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Capital PTE, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum GOM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?