Thompson v. Ortensie et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Thompson
Defendant: Robert A. Ortensie and Prewitt and Son Trucking Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00333
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Order remanding this action to the Circuit Court of Escambia County, Alabama for want of federal jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/23/2017. (tgw)
October 4, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiffs 5 Motion fora default judgment be DENIED. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/4/17. (tgw)
September 14, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing Plaintiff to file a memorandum of law regarding the amount in controversy by 9/28/2017, Responses due by 10/5/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/14/17. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Ortensie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Thompson
Represented By: Evan Gregory Allen
Represented By: Warner O Hornsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Ortensie
Represented By: David E. Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prewitt and Son Trucking Company
Represented By: David E. Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?