Diehl v. Paymap, Inc.

Plaintiff: Anastasia P. Diehl
Defendant: Paymap, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00017
Filed: January 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order denying 27 Notice of Filing Renewed Motion to Consolidate. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/13/2018. (tgw)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order denying the 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth and Fifth Counts in the Complaint. PayMap is ordered to file an answer to the complaint by 5/3/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/19/2018. (tgw)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Consolidate. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/16/2018. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diehl v. Paymap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia P. Diehl
Represented By: James Donnie Patterson
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paymap, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Burns Harrison Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?