Ductsox Corporation et al v. Prihoda s.r.o. et al
Plaintiff: Rite-Hite Holding Corporation and Ductsox Corporation
Defendant: Prihoda s.r.o., Air Movement Concepts, Inc. and Air Movement Concepts, Inc. doing business as Prihoda North America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00197
Filed: April 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Consented (unopposed) Motion for Extension of Time (30 days) for Defendants to respond to the Complaint, such that the new deadline is July 25, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/22/18. (gcp)
June 21, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time Stipulated by Plaintiffs and to Judge DuBose (nah)
June 21, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time Stipulated by Plaintiffs and by All Defendants. (Adams, James)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #2 , #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 05/17/2018. (nah)
May 17, 2018 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: #3 #2 . A review of the disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
May 1, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rite-Hite Holding Corporation. Air Movement Concepts, Inc. waiver sent on 4/27/2018, answer due 6/26/2018. (Strasavich, Michael)
May 1, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ductsox Corporation, Rite-Hite Holding Corporation. Prihoda s.r.o. waiver sent on 4/27/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. (Strasavich, Michael)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting #4 MOTION for Katherine W. Schill to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 MOTION for Patricia L. Jenness to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #6 MOTION for Jonathan H. Margolies to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 04/30/2018. (nah)
April 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Hunter Adams on behalf of All Defendants (Adams, James)
April 27, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Prihoda s.r.o and Air Movement Conceptions, Inc. dba Prihoda North America on 04/27/2018 by Ductsox Corporation, Rite-Hite Holding Corporation. Waiver of Service due by 6/26/2018. (Strasavich, Michael)
April 27, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Katherine W. Schill to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 MOTION for Patricia L. Jenness to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #6 MOTION for Jonathan H. Margolies to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (nah)
April 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Jonathan H. Margolies to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2216783, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Ductsox Corporation, Rite-Hite Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing) (Margolies, Jonathan)
April 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Patricia L. Jenness to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2216769, Online Credit Card Payment.) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission to Practice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Jenness, Patricia)
April 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Katherine W. Schill to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2216680, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Ductsox Corporation, Rite-Hite Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Application to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing) (Schill, Katherine)
April 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Rite-Hite Holding Corporation, Rite-Hite Company, LLC, Rite-Hite International, Inc., Rite-Hite Doors, Inc., Rite-Hite Aftermarket Corporation, Rite-Hite Environmental Enclosures Corporation, Ductsox Corporation, Arbon Equipment Corporation, Rite-Hite Products Corporation, Caljan Rite-Hite America, Inc., TechStrength Solutions, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Ductsox Corporation, Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Rite-Hite International, Inc., Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Doors, Inc., Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Aftermarket Corporation, Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Environmental Enclosures Corporation, Other Affiliate Arbon Equipment Corporation, Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Products Corporation, Other Affiliate Caljan Rite-Hite America, Inc., Other Affiliate TechStrength Solutions, Inc. for Rite-Hite Holding Corporation.. (Strasavich, Michael)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Ductsox Corporation, Rite-Hite Holding Corporation, Rite-Hite Company, LLC, Rite-Hite International, Inc., Rite-Hite Doors, Inc., Rite-Hite Aftermarket Corporation, Rite-Hite Environmental Enclosures Corporation, Arbon Equipment Corporation, Rite-Hite Products Corporation, Caljan Rite-Hite America, Inc., TechStrength Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite-Hite Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Rite-Hite International, Inc., Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Doors, Inc., Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Aftermarket Corporation, Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Environmental Enclosures Corporation, Other Affiliate Arbon Equipment Corporation, Other Affiliate Rite-Hite Products Corporation, Other Affiliate Caljan Rite-Hite America, Inc., Other Affiliate TechStrength Solutions, Inc. for Ductsox Corporation.. (Strasavich, Michael)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2215372, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Strasavich, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2018: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ductsox Corporation et al v. Prihoda s.r.o. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prihoda s.r.o.
Represented By: James Hunter Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Movement Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: James Hunter Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Movement Concepts, Inc. doing business as Prihoda North America
Represented By: James Hunter Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite-Hite Holding Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Represented By: Jonathan H. Margolies
Represented By: Taylor Barr Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Linn Jenness
Represented By: Katherine W. Schill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ductsox Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Represented By: Jonathan H. Margolies
Represented By: Katherine W. Schill
Represented By: Taylor Barr Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Linn Jenness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?