Mygrant et al v. Gulf Coast Restaurant Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Mygrant and Jonathan Webber
Defendant: Gulf Coast Restaurant Group, Inc., Half Shell Oyster House, Inc. and Robert Taylor
Case Number: 1:2018cv00264
Filed: June 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order re: 62 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Jonathan Webber, Bryan Mygrant. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks preliminary approval and denied to the extent it seeks final approval, as set out. The additional relief sought by the joint motion (doc. 52) is granted. This action is stayed administratively pending final approval as set out. See notice modifications as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/15/19. (cmj)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order re: 52 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Jonathan Webber, Bryan Mygrant. The parties are ordered to address the attorney's fee and release issues, and to submit a revised settlement agreement and notice and consent to join form by 10/7/19. (Deadline set for 10/7/2019.) The request to appoint Rust Consulting, Inc. as settlement administrator is granted. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/23/19. (cmj)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order for parties to file supplemental motion re: 52 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement, briefing and/or evidence as they deem sufficient to justify conditional certification and to establish appropriate parameters thereof. Supplement to motion deadline set for 9/6/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/23/19. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mygrant et al v. Gulf Coast Restaurant Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Mygrant
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Arciniegas
Represented By: Charles Peter Yezbak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Webber
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Arciniegas
Represented By: Charles Peter Yezbak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daisy Christina Karlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Half Shell Oyster House, Inc.
Represented By: Daisy Christina Karlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Taylor
Represented By: Daisy Christina Karlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?