Evanston Insurance Company v. Tudor Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Sparta Insurance Company, LIPCA, Inc., Tudor Insurance Company and Imperium Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00354
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement by Evanston Insurance Company (Johnston, Jamie)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 Sparta Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Sparta Insurance Company. (Jones, Allan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) Copies to counsel (mpp)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) Copies to counsel (mpp) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/19/2018) (mpp).
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. Imperium Insurance Company served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018 (Johnston, Jamie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Johnston, Jamie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. Sparta Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Johnston, Jamie)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order re: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LIPCA, Inc. (Responses due by 10/5/2018, Replies due by 10/12/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/17/18. (mpp) Copies to counsel
September 17, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mpp)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by LIPCA, Inc.. (Crosslin, Greg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg D. Crosslin on behalf of LIPCA, Inc. (Crosslin, Greg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Verified Answer of Lipca Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by LIPCA, Inc.. (Crosslin, Greg)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Imperium Insurance Company, LIPCA, Inc., Sparta Insurance Company, Tudor Insurance Company. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (mpp)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Evanston Insurance Company (Johnston, Jamie)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Evanston Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Johnston, Jamie)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Service Order entered 8/13/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 9/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/13/18. (mpp) Copy to Pltf.
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2264068, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Johnston, Jamie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Tudor Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparta Insurance Company
Represented By: Allan Sidney Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPCA, Inc.
Represented By: Greg D. Crosslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tudor Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperium Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie Austin Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?