Stanberry v. Jones

Petitioner: Derrick Michael Stanberry
Respondent: Warden Carla Jones
Case Number: 1:2018cv00362
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
0 Judge: Callie V S Granade
1 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 6 NOTICE of Change of Address (to Donaldson Correctional Facility) by Derrick Michael Stanberry. (tot)
August 27, 2018 5 Return of Service Executed as to Carla Jones; Attny Gen of the State of Alabama served on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (tot)
August 27, 2018 4 Return of Service, Carla Jones served 8/24/18. (tot)
August 24, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack W. Willis on behalf of Carla Jones (Willis, Jack)
August 22, 2018 2 Featured Case Order Directing Clerk to Serve copy of #1 Petition & this Order on Respondent Carla Jones & the Attorney General of the State of Alabama as set out. Respondent shall, within 60 days, answer & show cause why the writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/22/18. (copy mailed to Plf on 8/22/18) (tot) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #1 Cert. Mail Receipts) (tot).
August 20, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) filed by Derrick Michael Stanberry; Filing Fee: $5.00; Receipt No. 46031047871. (Attachments: #1 Receipt for Filing Fee) (Referred to MJ/Nelson(PSU) on 8/21/18) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanberry v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick Michael Stanberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Carla Jones
Represented By: Jack W. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?