Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. Peterson Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Defendant: Virgie S. Peterson, Peterson Produce, Inc. and Paul A. Peterson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00405
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Virgie S. Peterson and Paul A. Peterson by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Pierce, Samuel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against Paul A. Peterson, Virgie S. Peterson . (Pierce, Samuel)
November 7, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Virgie S. Peterson and Paul A. Peterson to Judge DuBose (nah)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order granting #6 MOTION to Stay. All claims asserted against Defendant Peterson Produce, Inc. are STAYED pending further Order of this Court. Defendant Peterson Produce, Inc. is ordered to file a Status Report by 4/5/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/05/2018. (nah)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #4 . A review of the disclosure statement has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Virgie S. Peterson served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018 (Pierce, Samuel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Pierce, Samuel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Peterson Produce, Inc. served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018 (Pierce, Samuel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Paul A. Peterson served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018 (Pierce, Samuel)
October 2, 2018 REFERRAL OF #9 Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay to Judge DuBose. (nah)
October 2, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Stay to Judge DuBose (nah)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay by Peterson Produce, Inc.. (Galloway, Robert)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Pierce, Samuel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paul A. Peterson, Virgie S. Peterson, Peterson Produce, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Pierce, Samuel)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2280896, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D) (Pierce, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. Peterson Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgie S. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Eric L. Pruitt
Represented By: Samuel Carlton Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?