United States of America v. $39,980.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $39,980.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Jon Terrell Gary
Case Number: 1:2018cv00420
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Answer due from Jon Terrell Gary. (tot)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 CLAIM by Jon Terrell Gary. (Friedlander, Jonathan) Modified on 11/6/2018 (tot).
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM-285 served 10/2/2018 as to $39,980.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency (skb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT for Arrest issued as to $39,980.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency. (tot)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint - Notice of Forfeiture Action (Attachments: #1 Text of Warrant for Arrest) (Atchison, Daryl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $39,980.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Atchison, Daryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $39,980.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $39,980.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daryl A. Atchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jon Terrell Gary
Represented By: Jonathan Blake Friedlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?