Gullett v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Torrance Gullett
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00423
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 10/23/2018 as to U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Cert Mail Confirmation) (srd)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service, SSA, Office of the General Counsel, served 10/9/18. (tot)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Nancy Berryhill; U.S. Attny served on 10/9/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (tot)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Nicole Beyer on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Beyer, Patricia)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/05/2018. (copy to U.S. Attny w/summons on 10/05/18). (srd)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill (U.S. Attny, SSA, U.S. Attny Gen). (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (srd)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Plf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as set out. Clerk is directed to serve a summons, along w/the complaint, on Dft as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/4/18. (tot)
October 2, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tot)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Torrance Gullett. (Holland, Laura)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Torrance Gullett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 Summons) (Holland, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gullett v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrance Gullett
Represented By: Laura Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?