Kim v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Sung Chul Kim
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00436
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332rp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 10:00 AM VIA TELEPHONE before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. District Judge William H. Steele no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (tgw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order setting a Scheduling Conference VIA TELEPHONE for 12/10/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/30/2018. (tgw)
November 30, 2018 REFERRAL OF #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (tgw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Brookshire, Jessica)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on the #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/16/2018. (tgw)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bottcher, Christopher)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bottcher, Christopher)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2290394, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Bottcher, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jessica Danielle Spade
Represented By: Christopher A. Bottcher
Represented By: Jessica Danielle Brookshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sung Chul Kim
Represented By: George Carroll Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?