The Solid Waste Disposal Authority of the City of Mobile, Alabama v. WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Solid Waste Disposal Authority of the City of Mobile, Alabama
Defendant: WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. and Waste Away Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00438
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 REFERRAL OF #16 Reply to Judge Bivins. (nah)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to #12 Reply, Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by The Solid Waste Disposal Authority of the City of Mobile, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Miller, Charles)
December 3, 2018 REFERRAL OF #14 Response to Motion to Strike to Judge Bivins. (nah)
December 3, 2018 REFERRAL OF #12 Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss and #15 Evidentiary Material - Notice of Filing Exhibit 5 to Judge Bivins. (nah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 Evidentiary Material Notice of Filing Exhibit 5 to #12 Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5) (Betbeze, Jaime) Modified on 12/3/2018 (nah).
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Strike Solid Waste Disposal Authority's Motion to Strike Exhibit 3 (Doc.3-4) to WM Mobile Bay's Motion to Dismiss filed by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 Evidentiary Material Notice of Filing Evidentiary Materials [Exhibit 5 (Thumbdrive)] filed by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. re: #12 Reply,. (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 19, 2018 REFERRAL OF #11 Response to Motion to Remand to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mcb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand Solid Waste Disposal Authority's Motion to Remand filed by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 16, 2018 REFERRAL OF #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mcb)
November 16, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Strike Solid Waste Disposal Authority's Motion to Strike Exhibit 3 (Doc.3-4) to WM Mobile Bay's Motion to Dismiss. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mcb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Solid Waste Disposal Authority's Response to WM Mobile Bay's Motion to Dismiss filed by The Solid Waste Disposal Authority of the City of Mobile, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Miller, Charles)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike Solid Waste Disposal Authority's Motion to Strike Exhibit 3 (Doc.3-4) to WM Mobile Bay's Motion to Dismiss by The Solid Waste Disposal Authority of the City of Mobile, Alabama. (Miller, Charles)
November 5, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Remand Solid Waste Disposal Authority's Motion to Remand - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (nah)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Solid Waste Disposal Authority's Motion to Remand by The Solid Waste Disposal Authority of the City of Mobile, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Miller, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 filed by Waste Away Group, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 filed by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Waste Away Group, Inc., Waste Management, Inc., Waste Management Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Waste Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Waste Management Holdings, Inc. for Waste Away Group, Inc... (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc., Waste Management, Inc., Waste Away Group, Inc., Waste Management Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Waste Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Waste Away Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Waste Management Holdings, Inc. for WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc... (Betbeze, Jaime)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. Responses due by 11/16/2018, Replies due by 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/25/2018. (nah)
October 25, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Dismiss - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (nah)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief of WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Betbeze, Jaime)
October 19, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Dismiss Fraudulently-Joined Defendant, Waste Away Group, Inc. - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (nah)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Fraudulently-Joined Defendant, Waste Away Group, Inc. by Waste Away Group, Inc.. (Betbeze, Jaime)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Waste Away Group, Inc., WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. from Circuit Court of Mobile County, AL, case number 02-CV-2018-902210. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2290955, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Waste Away Group, Inc., WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Betbeze, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Solid Waste Disposal Authority of the City of Mobile, Alabama v. WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Away Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Solid Waste Disposal Authority of the City of Mobile, Alabama
Represented By: Peter S. Mackey
Represented By: Peter F. Burns
Represented By: Charles L. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?