McCaskill v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Kiffany L. McCaskill
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00474
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 12/10/2018 as to U.S. Attorney General (tgw)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 12/7/2018 as to Social Security Administration (tgw)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 12/6/2018, answer due 3/6/2019. (tgw)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/4/2018. (tgw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (tgw)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/30/2018. (bld)
November 9, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tgw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kiffany L. McCaskill. (Thomas, Ashley)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Kiffany L. McCaskill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Thomas, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaskill v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiffany L. McCaskill
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?